Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 07:21:10 (UTC).

JONATHAN ROSENTHAL AS TRUSTEEE OF THE ROSENTHAL FAMILY TRUST VS GUENTER H. DYRENFORTH

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 JONATHAN ROSENTHAL AS TRUSTEEE OF THE ROSENTHAL FAMILY TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GUENTER H DYRENFORTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3084

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JONATHAN ROSENTHAL AS TRUSTEEE OF THE ROSENTHAL FAMILY TRUST

ROSENTHAL LYNN

ROSENTHAL JONATHAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DYRENFORTH GUENTER H.

MOORE-DYRENFORTH SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

DE CASTRO JOSE-MANUEL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER RICHARD T

MILLER RICHARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

6/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

6/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

General Denial

5/11/2021: General Denial

Cross-Complaint

5/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/6/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • Hearing07/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jonathan Rosenthal as Trusteee of The Rosenthal Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Guenter H. Dyrenforth (Cross-Complainant); Sandra Moore-Dyrenforth (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Guenter H. Dyrenforth (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Jonathan Rosenthal as Trusteee of The Rosenthal Family Trust (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sandra Moore-Dyrenforth (Cross-Complainant); Guenter H. Dyrenforth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by Guenter H. Dyrenforth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Guenter H. Dyrenforth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jonathan Rosenthal as Trusteee of The Rosenthal Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan Rosenthal as Trusteee of The Rosenthal Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan Rosenthal as Trusteee of The Rosenthal Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T