This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 17:36:42 (UTC).

JONATHAN OHEB MD, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, A CORPORATION; AND DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 JONATHAN OHEB MD, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, A CORPORATION AND DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9452

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONATHAN OHEB MD INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA A CORPORATION; AND DOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAGLE MARK J.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/04/2021

1/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/04/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/04/2020

12/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

9/16/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/4/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 01/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 12/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, a corporation; and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan Oheb MD, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan Oheb MD, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jonathan Oheb MD, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan Oheb MD, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGLE MARK J.