This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2023 at 12:30:26 (UTC).

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC. VS ZENTECH LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2023 JONATHAN NEIL ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ZENTECH LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4500

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendants

KAO YU SHAN AKA YUSHAN KAO AKA YU-SHAN KAO

ZENTECH LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/1/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/1/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/1/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/1/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/6/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Natalia A. Minassian, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name: A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketAddress for Natalia A. Minassian, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Zentech LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Zentech LLC, a Limited Liability Company to Zentech LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Zentech LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Yu Shan Kao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Zentech LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Yu Shan Kao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Zentech LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Yu Shan Kao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less