Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 10:44:42 (UTC).

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC. VS JING SHI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 JONATHAN NEIL ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JING SHI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2038

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendants

WANG SHERRY AKA SHERRY HSUEH LI WANG AKA SHERRY HSUEHLI WANG

SHI JING AKA JING ZHANG AKA JING SHI WANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINASSIAN NATALIA