This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 02:32:05 (UTC).

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC. VS DCX-CHOL ENTERPRISES INC., A COLORADO CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 JONATHAN NEIL ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DCX-CHOL ENTERPRISES INC , A COLORADO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendant

DCX-CHOL ENTERPRISES INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION DBA NEW VAC AKA MASTERITE DIV. AKA TELETRONICS DIV. AKA TELETRONIC LABORATORIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/30/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/30/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/30/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/30/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Timothy Patrick Dillon in Department 73 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAddress for Natalia A. Minassian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DCX-Chol Enterprises Inc., a Colorado Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DCX-Chol Enterprises Inc., a Colorado Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DCX-Chol Enterprises Inc., a Colorado Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less