This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 04:42:34 (UTC).

JONATHAN MEDINA VS MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 JONATHAN MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MAGIC MOUNTAIN, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6141

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA JONATHAN

Defendant

MAGIC MOUNTAIN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNES CARL D.

Defendant Attorney

AMARO MICHAEL LEE

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/6/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/8/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/22/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Magic Mountain, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jonathan Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGIC MOUNTAIN LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARNES CARL D.