Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:17:37 (UTC).

JONATHAN HUGHES VS STEVEN WILLIAM HALTERMAN

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 JONATHAN HUGHES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STEVEN WILLIAM HALTERMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4174

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUGHES JONATHAN

Defendant

HALTERMAN STEVEN WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEAGER KENNETH CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

GRGURIC SHERRY L

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer

1/24/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/24/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Summons

11/7/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/7/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/7/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Jonathan Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Steven William Halterman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Steven William Halterman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jonathan Hughes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH