This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2021 at 11:59:37 (UTC).

JONATHAN GUEVARA VS KEITH RODTS

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 JONATHAN GUEVARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEITH RODTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7009

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUEVARA JONATHAN

Defendant

RODTS KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN JESSE L.

Defendant Attorney

DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/16/2021: Answer

PI General Order

1/19/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Personal Service

1/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2023
  • Hearing12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Keith Rodts (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jonathan Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALPERN JESSE L.