This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 07:56:48 (UTC).

JONATHAN GRIGSBY VS MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 JONATHAN GRIGSBY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6845

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIGSBY JONATHAN

Defendant

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRICKLAND WILLIAM E.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

PI General Order

1/21/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Service by Mail

12/10/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/8/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JONATHAN GRIGSBY (Plaintiff); MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by JONATHAN GRIGSBY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JONATHAN GRIGSBY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JONATHAN GRIGSBY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JONATHAN GRIGSBY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRICKLAND WILLIAM EDWARD