This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 15:07:58 (UTC).

JONATHAN GOINS VS A1 VALET, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 JONATHAN GOINS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against A1 VALET, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8243

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOINS JONATHAN

Defendants

HARRIS STEPHEN

MARTIN LUTHER KING JR.-LOS ANGELES MLK-LA HEALTHCARE CORP.

A1 VALET INC.

SILVA EDUARDO

BROWN STEVEN

MUNOZ DANIEL

REED MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK JEREMY

Defendant Attorney

FISCH GREGG A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

11/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEREMY COOK RE OSC RE SERVICE

11/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEREMY COOK RE OSC RE SERVICE

Case Management Statement

11/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

11/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF O...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/27/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

10/15/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

9/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION AMENDED

9/10/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION AMENDED

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/10/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/27/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Jonathan Goins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for entry of default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for failure to file proof of service) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for failure to file proof o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Martin Luther King, Jr.-Los Angeles (MLK-LA) Healthcare Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jonathan Goins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Jeremy Cook re OSC re service); Filed by Jonathan Goins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan Goins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jonathan Goins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jeremy Cook (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information (AMENDED); Filed by Jeremy Cook (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan Goins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan Goins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jonathan Goins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN LUTHER KING JR.-LOS ANGELES MLK-LA HEALTHCARE CORPORATION is a litigant