This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 23:47:00 (UTC).

JONATHAN F. KOHAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 JONATHAN F KOHAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0573

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOHAN JONATHAN F.

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TERRY YORK MOTOR CARS LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A LAND ROVER ENCINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARNELL STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan F. Kohan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jonathan F. Kohan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jonathan F. Kohan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jonathan F. Kohan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan F. Kohan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TERRY YORK MOTOR CAR LTD DBA LAND ROVER ENCINO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARNELL STEPHEN