This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2023 at 11:13:54 (UTC).

JONATHAN CABRERA CHACON VS GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 JONATHAN CABRERA CHACON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8754

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA CHACON JONATHAN

Defendant

GOODWILL INDUSTRIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NERCESS CHARLENE

Defendant Attorney

HAZANY CATHERINE L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/13/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/13/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/20/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Jonathan Cabrera Chacon (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jonathan Cabrera Chacon (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/29/2022; Service Cost: 114.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jonathan Cabrera Chacon (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/20/2022; Service Cost: 124.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 12/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Charlene Nercess (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Levin & Nalbandyan, LLP to Levin & Nalbandyan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAddress for Charlene Nercess (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jonathan Cabrera Chacon (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jonathan Cabrera Chacon (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jonathan Cabrera Chacon (Plaintiff); As to: Goodwill Industries of Southern California, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less