This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 05:21:20 (UTC).

JONATHAN ALEJANDRO MELENDEZ VS SOUTHGATE AUTO INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 JONATHAN ALEJANDRO MELENDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTHGATE AUTO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2737

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Respondents

MELENDEZ JONATHAN ALEJANDRO

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

DOES 1-75

SOUTHGATE AUTO INC.

EXPRESS AUTO LENDING

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

Respondent, Defendant and Appellant

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

Respondents, Defendants and Not Classified By Court

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

DOES 1-75

SOUTHGATE AUTO INC.

EXPRESS AUTO LENDING

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC

JABARIN KARIM

SOUTHGATE AUTO INC. DBA EXPRESS AUTO LENDING

DEALER SERVICES & SUPPORT LLC

SAFEWAY AUTO CENTER INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

EXPRESS AUTO LENDING

RODRIGUEZ CESAR

MADISON LAW APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSNER HALLEN D.

KLITZKE MICHAEL A. ESQ.

KLITZKE MICHAEL A.

Defendant Attorneys

BAUTISTA ERIC JAY

CAMERON CLARK HOWARD

CAMERON CLARK H.

FIROUZNAM-HEIDARI JENOS

PARVANEH ALI

SIFERS JAMES STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

7/31/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL) NOA:7/31/20

8/11/2020: Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL) NOA:7/31/20

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

8/18/2020: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

8/28/2020: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B306976, NOA 7/31/20;

10/30/2020: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B306976, NOA 7/31/20;

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT (CCP 473))

12/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT (CCP 473))

Notice of Ruling

12/15/2020: Notice of Ruling

Judgment

6/4/2020: Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JUDGMENT) OF 06/04/2020

6/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JUDGMENT) OF 06/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JUDGMENT)

6/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JUDGMENT)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

6/4/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING THE JUDGMENT

6/17/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING THE JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SCHEDULING MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND ...)

6/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER SCHEDULING MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SCHEDULING MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND ...) OF 06/24/2020

6/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER SCHEDULING MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND ...) OF 06/24/2020

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING THE JUDGMENT CURRENTLY SET FOR DECEMB

7/8/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING THE JUDGMENT CURRENTLY SET FOR DECEMB

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

7/8/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE AND SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

7/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

211 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered (1-VOL REPORTERS); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B306976, NOA 7/31/20;); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:7/31/20); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
260 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Jonathan Alejandro Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketPLAINTFF'S NOTICE OF ERRATA TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ACTUAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jonathan Alejandro Melendez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHGATE AUTO INC. DBA EXPRESS AUTO LENDING is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Auto Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant