This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2023 at 11:55:48 (UTC).

JON SZEWCYK VS KATHERINE STANCL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 JON SZEWCYK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KATHERINE STANCL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNNE M. HOBBS and JILL FEENEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8888

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LYNNE M. HOBBS

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SZEWCYK JON

Defendants and Cross Defendants

STANCL KATHERINE

HIROSHI YAMADA

KELTERBORN FELICIA

STANCL GREGORY

LESSIN JUDITH

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

HIROSHI YAMADA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NAZARIAN JOSEPH JOHN

ROBERTS JEFFREY TRAVIS

Defendant Attorney

GATES PETER J

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KIMURA JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/5/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1: TO EXCLUDE USE OF THE SUDDEN EMERGENCY DEFENSE (CACI 452)

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 1: TO EXCLUDE USE OF THE SUDDEN EMERGENCY DEFENSE (CACI 452)

Jury Instructions

5/3/2023: Jury Instructions

Exhibit List

5/3/2023: Exhibit List

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO PREVENT DEFENDANTS FROM INTRODUCTING EVIDENCE ABOUT PLAINTIFFS CHILD CUSTODY DISPUTE

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: TO PREVENT DEFENDANTS FROM INTRODUCTING EVIDENCE ABOUT PLAINTIFFS CHILD CUSTODY DISPUTE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF JON SZEWCYKS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALTERNATE CAUSE

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF JON SZEWCYKS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALTERNATE CAUSE

Statement of the Case

5/3/2023: Statement of the Case

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF WAS REFERRED TO DOCTORS BY AN ATTORNEY

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF WAS REFERRED TO DOCTORS BY AN ATTORNEY

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF JON SZEWCZYKS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFF'S USE OF MARIJUANA

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF JON SZEWCZYKS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFF'S USE OF MARIJUANA

Witness List

5/3/2023: Witness List

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7: TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF JON SZEWCZYK TO TESTIFY AS TO THE FULL AMOUNTS BILLED FOR HIS MEDICAL TREATMENT

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7: TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF JON SZEWCZYK TO TESTIFY AS TO THE FULL AMOUNTS BILLED FOR HIS MEDICAL TREATMENT

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: TO PREVENT DEFENDANTS AND THEIR EXPERTS FROM PUBLISHING, REFERENCING, OR ADMITTING MEDICAL RECORD HEARSAY INTO EVIDENCE WITHOUT T

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: TO PREVENT DEFENDANTS AND THEIR EXPERTS FROM PUBLISHING, REFERENCING, OR ADMITTING MEDICAL RECORD HEARSAY INTO EVIDENCE WITHOUT T

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MITIGATE DAMAGES BY NOT TREATING THROUGH HEALTH INSURANCE FOR PAST MEDICAL CARE

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MITIGATE DAMAGES BY NOT TREATING THROUGH HEALTH INSURANCE FOR PAST MEDICAL CARE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 9: TO PREVENT DEFENDANTS EXPERT NEUROSURGON FROM TESTIFIYING OUTSIDE OF HIS AREA OF EXPERTISE

5/3/2023: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER 9: TO PREVENT DEFENDANTS EXPERT NEUROSURGON FROM TESTIFIYING OUTSIDE OF HIS AREA OF EXPERTISE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

4/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/20/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Informal Discovery Conference

4/5/2023: Informal Discovery Conference

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/15/2023

Hearing08/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

Hearing08/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/15/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Katherine Stancl (Defendant); Gregory Stancl (Defendant); Judith Lessin (Defendant); As to: Jon Szewcyk (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/09/2023 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by: Jon Szewcyk (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketExhibit List; Filed by: Jon Szewcyk (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
12/23/2020

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2020

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jon Szewcyk (Plaintiff); As to: Katherine Stancl (Defendant); Gregory Stancl (Defendant); Judith Lessin (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2020

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jon Szewcyk (Plaintiff); As to: Katherine Stancl (Defendant); Gregory Stancl (Defendant); Judith Lessin (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jon Szewcyk (Plaintiff); As to: Katherine Stancl (Defendant); Gregory Stancl (Defendant); Judith Lessin (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2020

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2020

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2020

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2020

DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 12/23/2020 to 12/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2020

DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 12/23/2020 to 12/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2020

DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: Status Date changed from 12/23/2020 to 12/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less