This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2023 at 04:22:20 (UTC).

JON PURPURA VS EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 JON PURPURA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0869

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PURPURA JON

Defendants

EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON

NAVIKA CAPITOL GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX STEVE

Defendant Attorney

HARWELL LILLIAN C.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/2/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/3/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

1/6/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2025
  • Hearing11/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2023
  • Hearing12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jon Purpura (Plaintiff); As to: Navika Capitol Group LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 12/02/2022; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jon Purpura (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton (Defendant); Service Date: 12/24/2022; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Navika Capitol Group LLC (Defendant); As to: Jon Purpura (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Final Status Conference scheduled for 12/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 12/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen Morgan in Department A14 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/05/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/03/2025 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jon Purpura (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jon Purpura (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton (Defendant); Navika Capitol Group LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jon Purpura (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton (Defendant); Navika Capitol Group LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jon Purpura (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton (Defendant); Navika Capitol Group LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jon Purpura (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less