Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:29:26 (UTC).

JON MAHDIAN VS PAMELA D WILSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 JON MAHDIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PAMELA D WILSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7251

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MAHDIAN JON

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 30

WILSON HENRY

BEVERLY HILLS HOMES AND ESTATES

WILSON PAMELA D.

Not Classified By Court

BERKOWITZ MARC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ULLOA ADELA ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ASHLIE E. FOX

FOX ASHLIE E.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Writ of Execution

2/26/2019: Writ of Execution

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/15/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

12/18/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/17/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME AND ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ASHLIE E. FO

10/20/2017: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME AND ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ASHLIE E. FO

DECLARATION OF ADELA Z. ULLOA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/20/2017: DECLARATION OF ADELA Z. ULLOA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION RE: DISMISSAL OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS

10/17/2017: DECLARATION RE: DISMISSAL OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS

VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/4/2017: VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

8/16/2017: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

8/16/2017: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

Minute Order

8/16/2017: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

9/7/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DECLARATION OF ASHLIE E. FOX RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE

9/11/2017: DECLARATION OF ASHLIE E. FOX RE: TELEPHONIC NOTICE

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) AND TO CLAIM ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION; AND EXHIBITS IN S

9/13/2017: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) AND TO CLAIM ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION; AND EXHIBITS IN S

CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING

9/19/2017: CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

9/22/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) AND TO CLAIM ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

9/29/2017: DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) AND TO CLAIM ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Henry Wilson (Defendant); Pamela D. Wilson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Marc Berkowitz (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Marc Berkowitz (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Marc Berkowitz (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Marc Berkowitz (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Beverly Hills Homes and Estates (Defendant); Henry Wilson (Defendant); Pamela D. Wilson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 50; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Henry Wilson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Henry Wilson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pamela D. Wilson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jon Mahdian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jon Mahdian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC667251    Hearing Date: January 21, 2021    Dept: 50

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

jon mahdian,

Plaintiff,

vs.

gloria harrison, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 667251

Hearing Date:

January 21, 2021

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION

Defendants and judgment creditors Pamela D. Wilson and Henry Wilson apply for an order for appearance and examination of Plaintiff and judgment debtor Jon Mahdian. The Court finds that Defendants have complied with the relevant procedural requirements (CCP § 708.110(a) and LASC Rule 3.221).

Accordingly, the Court grants the application.

DATED: January 21, 2021

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ULLOA ADELA