Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2019 at 07:09:19 (UTC).

JON C. SAMUELSON VS JAY JOSEPH DAVIS AND SHERI L. DAVIS

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 JON C SAMUELSON filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against JAY JOSEPH DAVIS AND SHERI L DAVIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9977

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMUELSON JON C. A SINGLE MAN

Defendants

DAVIS JAY JOSEPH HUSBAND

DAVIS SHERI L. WIFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. HILLARY GROSBERG

GROSBERG A. HILLARY

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest -

10/9/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest -

Writ - Return

10/29/2018: Writ - Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((los angeles)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((LOS ANGELES)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketWrit-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by JON C. A SINGLE MAN SAMUELSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketWrit-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JON C. A SINGLE MAN SAMUELSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSister State Judgment; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by JON C. A SINGLE MAN SAMUELSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by JON C. A SINGLE MAN SAMUELSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSBERG ANN HILLARY