This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 01:18:44 (UTC).

JOLIE ZHOU VS QIN XU, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 JOLIE ZHOU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against QIN XU,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVATORE SIRNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1207

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SALVATORE SIRNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

ZHOU JOLIE

Defendants

MABAO LI

XU QIN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

XU QIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADVIENTO MARVIN

Defendant Attorney

HSU ROGER C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

2/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;) OF 02/22/2023, MINUTE ORDER

2/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;) OF 02/22/2023, MINUTE ORDER

Case Management Statement

2/22/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/15/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

2/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE REMOTE APPEARANCE

2/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE REMOTE APPEARANCE

Cross-Complaint

1/5/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

1/5/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/1/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/11/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/10/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Wesley L. Hsu; Reason: Challenge / Recusal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Qin Xu (Defendant); Baoli Ma Erroneously Sued As Li Mabao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference;) of 02/22/2023, Minute Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Jolie Zhou (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jolie Zhou (Plaintiff); As to: Qin Xu (Defendant); Baoli Ma Erroneously Sued As Li Mabao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Qin Xu (Cross-Complainant); Baoli Ma Erroneously Sued As Li Mabao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 02/22/2023 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Department A to Department G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department A Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jolie Zhou (Plaintiff); As to: Qin Xu (Defendant); Li Mabao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jolie Zhou (Plaintiff); As to: Qin Xu (Defendant); Li Mabao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jolie Zhou (Plaintiff); As to: Qin Xu (Defendant); Li Mabao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less