This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 06:37:34 (UTC).

JOHNSON DIVERSIFED, INC...; ET AL VS DEACON CORP...; ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 JOHNSON DIVERSIFED, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEACON CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT B. BROADBELT and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2205

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PLUMBING SOLUTIONS A CALIFORNIA CORP.

JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED INC.

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ...

DOES 1-20

DEACON CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TESTA GREGORY JAMES

GREGORY J. TESTA

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD S. PRICE II

RUTAN & TUCKER

PRICE RICHARD SELWYN II

BLANCHARD PHILIP JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/21/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

7/21/2017: Complaint

Summons

7/21/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/21/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/10/2017: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown

8/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/18/2017: Unknown

Answer

9/18/2017: Answer

Answer

9/18/2017: Answer

Case Management Statement

11/27/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/4/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/7/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

12/21/2017: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/15/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Stipulation

8/21/2018: Stipulation

Notice

8/24/2018: Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

1/8/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

2/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Due to the unavailability of the court on 2/7/19...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice OF CASE REASIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by PLUMBING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORP. (Plaintiff); JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 11; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by PLUMBING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORP. (Plaintiff); JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by PLUMBING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORP. (Plaintiff); JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Declaration of Service; Filed by PLUMBING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORP. (Plaintiff); JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by PLUMBING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORP. (Plaintiff); JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Summons; Filed by PLUMBING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORP. (Plaintiff); JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOHNSON DIVERSIFIED, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less