Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2020 at 06:30:10 (UTC).

JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION LP VS DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0499

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION LP FKA SIMPLEXGRINNELL LP A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

CONTINENTAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CDC MADRONA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLASHMAN JEFFREY

Defendant Attorney

ORLAND JAMES

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS)

8/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PMK DEPOSITION

7/20/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PMK DEPOSITION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/20/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARC SEIDNER

7/20/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARC SEIDNER

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

7/23/2020: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/08/2020

4/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/08/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Ruling

2/4/2020: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

9/24/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE CR...)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE CR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE CR...) OF 12/04/2019

12/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: POSSIBLE CR...) OF 12/04/2019

Case Management Statement

9/19/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/6/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/6/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

6/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • Hearing12/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Hearing11/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Status Conference (resettlement negotiations) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: settlement negotiations)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketReply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition); Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Management Conference); Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum); Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONTINENTAL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SimplexGrinnell, LP is a litigant