This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 03:04:38 (UTC).

JOHNSON, CLIFTON J. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 JOHNSON, CLIFTON J - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9948

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HUBERT JOHNSON

JOHNSON HUBERT SR

Claimant

DCM SERVICES

Respondent

BOURGEOIS DEYONNE

Decedent

JOHNSON CLIFTON J.

Others

JOHNSON WELTON

PLAISANCE DELORES J.

JOHNSON LEONARD JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HULKOWER M WALTER

OLDMAN MARSHAL ALAN

Other Attorney

YUN MONICA CHUNG

 

Court Documents

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearings

4/15/2020: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearings

Minute Order

7/2/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing

5/21/2020: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing

Creditor's Claim - Sprint Solutions

4/15/2020: Creditor's Claim - Sprint Solutions

Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - Objections to Competing Petition for Letters of Special Administration

9/15/2020: Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - Objections to Competing Petition for Letters of Special Administration

Minute Order

10/13/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/13/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing

10/15/2020: Notice - Ruling - Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing

Minute Order

7/2/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/5/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Notice of Limited Availability of Counsel

3/24/2020: Notice - Notice of Limited Availability of Counsel

Minute Order

3/30/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/30/2020: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Appointment of Special Administrator

1/22/2020: Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Appointment of Special Administrator

Minute Order

1/23/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

1/24/2020: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/16/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - to Petition for Letters of Special Administration filed by Hubert Johnson

3/16/2020: Objection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate - to Petition for Letters of Special Administration filed by Hubert Johnson

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Notice of Ruling and Continuance of Hearing ); Filed by Objector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketObjection - Subsequent Petition Decedent's Estate (Objections to Competing Petition for Letters of Special Administration ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice - Continuance; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketWill in Safekeeping (4 pgs - Dated - 09/17/2008 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Special Admin w/Gen Powers (Initial) (SAFEKEEPING# 19STSK02376 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCM SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YUN MONICA CHUNG