This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 01:37:40 (UTC).

JOHNNY SALINAS MARTINEZ, ET AL. VS NBA AUTOMOTIVE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 JOHNNY SALINAS MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NBA AUTOMOTIVE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9612

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ JOHNNY SALINAS

WONG KASSIDY

ESPINOZA ALONSO

VELASQUEZ CRUZ TERESA

ESPINO MIGUEL

Defendants

NBA AUTOMOTIVE INC.

RHC AUTOMOTIVE INC.

RHH AUTOMOTIVE INC.

NISSANI HOOMAN

HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSNER ZACHARY MILES

Defendant Attorney

MCCREARY DUNCAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

2/18/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NON-CLASS ACTION DESIGNATION) OF 01/21/2021

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NON-CLASS ACTION DESIGNATION) OF 01/21/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NON-CLASS ACTION DESIGNATION)

1/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NON-CLASS ACTION DESIGNATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

1/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 01/29/2021

1/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 01/29/2021

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Johnny Salinas Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Johnny Salinas Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 01/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 2:10 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non-Class Action Designation) of 01/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non-Class Action Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Johnny Salinas Martinez (Plaintiff); Miguel Espino (Plaintiff); Alonso Espinoza (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Johnny Salinas Martinez (Plaintiff); Miguel Espino (Plaintiff); Alonso Espinoza (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RHH AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RHC AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NBA AUTOMOTIVE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA NISSANI BROS CHEVROLET is a litigant