This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 03:38:20 (UTC).

JOHN ZAIKA VS VINCENT BILBRO

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 JOHN ZAIKA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VINCENT BILBRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3839

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ZAIKA JOHN

Defendants and Respondents

BILBRO VINCENT

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WOLF JEFFREY D. ESQ.

WOLF JEFFREY DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ROTH HEATHER

ROTH HEATHER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

2/12/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 02/16/2021

2/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 02/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

2/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 11/09/2020

11/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 11/09/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

6/11/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL;)

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL;)

Notice of Ruling

11/7/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUE THE TRIAL

8/23/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUE THE TRIAL

Answer

3/25/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/11/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/16/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice - NOTICE CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

5/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE CHANGE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS -

2/13/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/13/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Vincent Bilbro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 02/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by John Zaika (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Vincent Bilbro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates]; Filed by Vincent Bilbro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (Change of Email Address); Filed by Vincent Bilbro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Vincent Bilbro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by John Zaika (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Vincent Bilbro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by John Zaika (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Zaika (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693839    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: 2

Zaika v. Bilbro

Good cause having been shown, the Court grants the unopposed motion to the continue the trial. The motion and discovery cut offs and all related dates are to be calculated based on the new trial date. The current trial and FSC dates are advanced to today’s date and vacated. The Court sets the following dates:

FSC: June 30, 2020

Trial: July 14, 2020

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROTH HEATHER M.