Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 09:58:19 (UTC).

JOHN WILSON CO., INC., A CORPORATION VS KEVIN MICHAEL MC CAAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 JOHN WILSON CO , INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KEVIN MICHAEL MC CAAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0923

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN WILSON CO. INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

MC CAAN KEVIN MICHAEL DBA INTERNATIONAL CONSTRUCTION;

XLD GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BURROWS LEE

Other Attorneys

SOSA CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/5/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/29/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/16/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/14/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • Hearing06/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by John Wilson Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kevin Michael Mc Caan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by John Wilson Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by John Wilson Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John Wilson Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Wilson Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Wilson Co., Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XLD GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E