This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 06:26:43 (UTC).

JOHN VORZIMER ET AL VS STEVEN BERKOWITZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 JOHN VORZIMER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STEVEN BERKOWITZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0628

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VORZIMER JOHN

VORZIMER SAMANTHA

Defendants

THE KADISH LAW GROUP PC

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN BERKOWITZ

BERKOWITZ STEVEN

THE BERKOWITZ LAW GROUP

GLASSMAN BROWNING SALTSMAN & JACOBS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER DAVID BRUCE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

WALSHOK COLIN HOWARD

MURPHY JAMES ANTHONY

SERVAIS ANDREW A

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND PROTETIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

1/31/2018: STIPULATION AND PROTETIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

NOTICE OF RULING RE: APPROVAL OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ETC.

2/6/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: APPROVAL OF STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ETC.

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/23/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/28/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL DATE

3/1/2018: NOTICE OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

3/1/2018: Minute Order

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT TUE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND SANCTIONS

5/21/2018: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT TUE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND SANCTIONS

DECLARATION OF ANDREW A. SERVAIS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AN

5/21/2018: DECLARATION OF ANDREW A. SERVAIS IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AN

Proof of Service

5/21/2018: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL B KADISH IN SUPPORT OF CROSS- COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AN

5/21/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL B KADISH IN SUPPORT OF CROSS- COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AN

CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, PC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND SANCTIONS

5/21/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, PC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND SANCTIONS

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND SANCTIONS

5/21/2018: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND SANCTIONS

DEFENDANTS STEVEN BERKOWITZ, LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN BERKOWITZ, A.P.C, THE BERKOWITZ LAW GROUP, A.P.C., AND THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C. NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

8/3/2018: DEFENDANTS STEVEN BERKOWITZ, LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN BERKOWITZ, A.P.C, THE BERKOWITZ LAW GROUP, A.P.C., AND THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C. NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND

8/7/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT THE KADISH LAW GROUP, P.C.'S MOTION TO COMPEL CROSS-DEFENDANT JOHN VORZIMER'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND

DECLARATION OF ROGER BROWNING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GLASSMAN, BROWNING, SALTSMAN & JACOBS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/9/2018: DECLARATION OF ROGER BROWNING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GLASSMAN, BROWNING, SALTSMAN & JACOBS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GLASSMAN, BROWNING, SALTSMAN & JACOBS INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/9/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GLASSMAN, BROWNING, SALTSMAN & JACOBS INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF KRISTIN L. IVERSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GLASSMAN, BROWNING, SALTSMAN & JACOBS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/9/2018: DECLARATION OF KRISTIN L. IVERSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GLASSMAN, BROWNING, SALTSMAN & JACOBS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

140 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by The Berkowitz Law Group (Defendant); The Kadish Law Group PC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:46 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); Law Offices Of Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); The Berkowitz Law Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); Law Offices Of Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); The Berkowitz Law Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Servais ISO Kadish-Berkowitz CONTINUED Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); Law Offices Of Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); The Berkowitz Law Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice (of CONTINUED Motion and Kadish-Berkowitz Continued Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); Law Offices Of Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); The Berkowitz Law Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (without Exhibits iso Kadish-Berkowitz CONTINUED Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); Law Offices Of Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); The Berkowitz Law Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Berkowitz ISO Kadish-Berkowitz CONTINUED Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); Law Offices Of Steven Berkowitz (Defendant); The Berkowitz Law Group (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
242 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by John Vorzimer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0628    Hearing Date: September 17, 2020    Dept: 19

After consideration of the briefing and pleadings filed, Plaintiff John Vorzimer’s and Plaintiff Samantha Vorzimer’s Motion to Tax [and/or Strike] Costs of Defendants Steven Berkowitz, Law Offices of Steve Berkowitz, the Berkowitz Law Group, and the Kadish Law Group is GRANTED in its entirety. The motion is unopposed. On September 11, 2020, Defendants filed a "Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax Costs," stating that they do not oppose the items identified in the motion.

Accordingly, Defendants' costs are reduced in the amount of

Counsel for the Plaintiffs to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER, DAVID B