This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 10:56:18 (UTC).

JOHN VILLANUEVA, JR. VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 JOHN VILLANUEVA, JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0441

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLANUEVA JOHN JR.

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN Y. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

OH ROBERT SAEHAN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/25/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/25/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/31/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

6/22/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2023
  • Hearing12/05/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2023
  • Hearing11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • Hearing09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: ADR scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40 updated: Result Date to 06/23/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only; Signed and Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); As to: John Villanueva, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only: Filed By: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 06/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: John Villanueva, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 03/28/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Villanueva, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Villanueva, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Villanueva, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OH, ROBERT S.