This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2022 at 06:01:07 (UTC).

JOHN T.A.U. DOE, ET AL. VS DEFENDANT DOE 1, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 JOHN T A U DOE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DEFENDANT DOE 1. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9401

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B.R.U. DOE JOHN

B.T.U. DOE JOHN

C.G.U. DOE JOHN

E.R.U. DOE JOHN

R.A.U. DOE JOHN

T.A.U. DOE JOHN

Defendants

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

SANTA MONICA POLICE ACTIVITIES LEAGUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMARCO ANTHONY M.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/22/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN T.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN T.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN B.T.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN B.T.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

Certificate - CERTIFICATE CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATIVE FACT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1(M)(1)

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATIVE FACT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1(M)(1)

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN T.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN T.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN B.T.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN B.T.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN T.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE1

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN T.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE1

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN B.T.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN B.T.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN E.R.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN E.R.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN R.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN R.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN R.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN R.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(1), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN E.R.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN E.R.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN E.R.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN E.R.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 1

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN R.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN R.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN T.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

6/20/2022: Certificate - CERTIFICATE PLAINTIFF JOHN T.A.U. DOE'S CERTIFICATE OF MERIT PURSUANT TO CCP 340.1, SUBDS. (F) AND (G)(2), AS TO DEFENDANT DOE 2

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( For In Camera Review of Plaintiffs' Certificates of Merit and Certificate of Corroborative Fact; Motion to Seal the Certificates of Merit and Certificate of Corroborative Fact; Supporting Declaration; and An Order As To The Same) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For In Camera Review of Plai...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Proposed Order; Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate (Plaintiff John B.T.U. Doe's Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CCP 340.1, subds. (f) and (g)(2), as to Defendant Doe 1); Filed by JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate (Plaintiff John R.A.U. Doe's Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CCP 340.1, subds. (f) and (g)(2), as to Defendant Doe 1); Filed by JOHN R.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate (Plaintiff John R.A.U. Doe's Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CCP 340.1, subds. (f) and (g)(2), as to Defendant Doe 2); Filed by JOHN R.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOHN T.A.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN C.G.U. DOE (Plaintiff); JOHN B.T.U. DOE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA MONICA POLICE ACTIVITIES LEAGUE A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEMARCO ANTHONY M.