This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 13:41:02 (UTC).

JOHN TAISIK AN VS YONG BAE PARK ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 JOHN TAISIK AN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YONG BAE PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2863

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AN JOHN TAISIK

Defendants

PARK YONG BAE

AN IN KI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PARK KYUNGSOO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/20/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown

1/11/2019: Unknown

Unknown

4/12/2019: Unknown

Judgment

4/12/2019: Judgment

Minute Order

4/12/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Mail

4/12/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/12/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/12/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGE: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

3/8/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGE: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

SUMMONS

3/8/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

3/17/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/17/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT IN KI AN TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

4/10/2017: DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT IN KI AN TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/10/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/10/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT IN KI AN TO COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF KYUNGSOO PARK

4/28/2017: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT IN KI AN TO COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF KYUNGSOO PARK

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 49; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by John Taisik An (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (Request for Default Judgment by Court;); Filed by John Taisik An (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by John Taisik An (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by John Taisik An (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketDefault Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Taisik An (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGE: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2863    Hearing Date: July 13, 2020    Dept: 49

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

John Taisik An,

Plaintiff,

Case No.

****2863

v.

[Tentative] Ruling

Yong Bae Park, et al.,

Defendants.

Hearing Date: July 13, 2020

Department 49, Judge Stuart M. Rice

(1) Defendant Yong Bae Park’s Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment

Moving Party:  Defendant Yong Bae Park

Responding Party:      Plaintiff John An Taisik

Ruling: The motion to set aside the entry of default and default judgment is denied. 

The initial date scheduled for the hearing on this motion was August 20, 2019. On that date, the hearing was continued to October 7, 2019 because plaintiff had not been served with the motion. On October 7, 2019, the hearing was again continued, to January 14, 2020, to provide an opportunity for the substitution of a personal representative for defendant Yong Bae Park who died sometime after the initial hearing date of August 20, 2019. Due to the unavailability of a Korean interpreter on January 14, 2020, this matter was continued to March 12, 2020. Ultimately, the matter was continued to this date. Since October, no filings have been made except for declarations by pro per plaintiff John Taisik An, advocating for the denial of this motion. 

A judgment cannot be given for or against a decedent or his or her personal representative until the personal representative has been made a party by substitution. (Grappo v. McMills (2017) 11 Cal.App.5th 996, 1001-1009 see also Code Civ. Proc. ; 377.41.) Despite the ample time the court allowed for a personal representative to be substituted in on behalf of deceased defendant Park, no such substitution has occurred. Therefore, Park’s motion to vacate the default and default judgment against him is denied. Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Date: July 13, 2020

Honorable Stuart M. Rice

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK KYUNGSOO .