This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 00:08:15 (UTC).

JOHN SALINGER ET AL VS CHANGEMYRATE.COM ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 JOHN SALINGER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CHANGEMYRATE COM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0833

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SALINGER JOHN

HUNT DEDRA

HERRERA EFRAIN

Defendants and Respondents

ANDERSON LOWELL

CHANGEMYRATE.COM

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

GRAVES JACKIE A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VICTIM COMPENSATION LAW GROUP APC

HINES GARRETT JAMAL

Defendant Attorney

WYATT ANDREW MICHAEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/22/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/23/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT RE: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES [CODE CIV. PROC. 425.115, CIVIL CODE 3294)

3/23/2018: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT RE: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES [CODE CIV. PROC. 425.115, CIVIL CODE 3294)

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT RE: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES (CODE CIV. PROC. 425.115, CIVIL CODE 3294)

3/23/2018: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT RE: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES (CODE CIV. PROC. 425.115, CIVIL CODE 3294)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/23/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

4/23/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/23/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS OF JACKIE GRAVES AND LOWELL ANDERSON

7/12/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS OF JACKIE GRAVES AND LOWELL ANDERSON

Minute Order

7/23/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/5/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/5/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/15/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

10/23/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/23/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

10/23/2017: SUMMONS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Changemyrate.com (Defendant); Jackie A. Graves (Defendant); Lowell Anderson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DEFENDANTS CHANGEMYRATES.COM, JACKIE GRAVES, AND LOWELL ANDERSON'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS OF JACKIE GRAVES AND LOWELL ANDERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by John Salinger (Plaintiff); Dedra Hunt (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WHISTLEBLOWER RETALIATION IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 1102.5 ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by John Salinger (Plaintiff); Dedra Hunt (Plaintiff); Efrain Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHANGEMYRATE.COM is a litigant