This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2023 at 11:52:15 (UTC).

JOHN ROE 71 VS THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 JOHN ROE 71 filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8125

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROE 71 JOHN

Defendants

MISSIONARIES OF THE HOLY SPIRIT

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MURADIAN VACHE V.

CAMASTRA RYAN

CARNEY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/29/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/06/2022

9/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 09/06/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

9/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 09/06/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 11 - Hon. David S. Cunningham III; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Roe 71 (Plaintiff); As to: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles (Defendant); Missionaries of The Holy Spirit (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Roe 71 (Plaintiff); As to: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles (Defendant); Missionaries of The Holy Spirit (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Roe 71 (Plaintiff); As to: The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles (Defendant); Missionaries of The Holy Spirit (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less