Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 01:39:17 (UTC).

JOHN P MCANDREW VS EDWARD F BIGGS ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/22/2017 JOHN P MCANDREW filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDWARD F BIGGS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL P. LINFIELD, JAMES C. CHALFANT and MARC MARMARO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4484

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

JAMES C. CHALFANT

MARC MARMARO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCANDREW JOHN P.

Defendants and Respondents

PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

BIGGS EDWARD F.

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROHATINER MARC E. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WEAVER LARRY WAYNE

RUBIN JULIE H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (INSTRUMENT NO. 20180032457)

1/17/2018: RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (INSTRUMENT NO. 20180032457)

DECLARATIONS OF JOHN P. MCANDREW, CYRUS S. WHITTAKER, RON DORFMAN, AND EDWARD E. WEIMAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING O

1/18/2018: DECLARATIONS OF JOHN P. MCANDREW, CYRUS S. WHITTAKER, RON DORFMAN, AND EDWARD E. WEIMAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING O

DECLARATION OF MARGARITA LOPEZ IN OPPOSITION JOHN MCANDREW'S REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/1/2018: DECLARATION OF MARGARITA LOPEZ IN OPPOSITION JOHN MCANDREW'S REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

DECLARATION OF EDWARDS BIGGS IN OPPOSITION JOHN MCANDREW'S REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/1/2018: DECLARATION OF EDWARDS BIGGS IN OPPOSITION JOHN MCANDREW'S REQUEST FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/5/2018: REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF POSTING CASHBOND

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING CASHBOND

OBJECTION BY EDWARD BIGGS AND PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES, LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ETC

2/21/2018: OBJECTION BY EDWARD BIGGS AND PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES, LLC TO PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER; ETC.

2/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER; ETC.

PLAINTIFF JOHN P. MCANDREW'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/18/2018: PLAINTIFF JOHN P. MCANDREW'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order

4/19/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

4/19/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/23/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE: OF: TAKING MO.TICNFORJUDGMEN.T ON THE PLEADINGS OFF CALENDAR

9/5/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE: OF: TAKING MO.TICNFORJUDGMEN.T ON THE PLEADINGS OFF CALENDAR

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ETC

11/22/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ETC

DECLARATION OF MARC E. ROHATINER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

11/22/2017: DECLARATION OF MARC E. ROHATINER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

11/27/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF EDWARD BIGGS AND PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES, LLC IN OPPOSITION TO JOHN MCANDREW'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

11/27/2017: SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF EDWARD BIGGS AND PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES, LLC IN OPPOSITION TO JOHN MCANDREW'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

SUMMONS

11/22/2017: SUMMONS

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 37; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 37; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DEFENDANTS' NOTICE: OF: TAKING MO.TICNFORJUDGMEN.T ON THE PLEADINGS OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice; Filed by JOHN P. MCANDREW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • RECORDED NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [INSTRUMENT NO. 20180793017]

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-11-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JOHN P. MCANDREW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF MARC E. ROHATINER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by JOHN P. MCANDREW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF KEVIN HERMANSEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEAVER LARRY WAYNE