This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 13:42:42 (UTC).

JOHN OC-18 DOE VS ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 JOHN OC-18 DOE filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7998

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OC-18 DOE JOHN

Defendants

PRECIADO RUDOLPH

ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF ORANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOLAN CRISTINA J.

Defendant Attorney

NATELBORG KENNETH M.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/5/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/5/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

12/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 12/29/2022

12/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 12/29/2022

Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM OF AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT FOR PLAINTIFF JOHN OC-18 DOE

3/21/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION FORM OF AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT FOR PLAINTIFF JOHN OC-18 DOE

Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/25/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Master Complaint for Damages; Filed by: Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange (Defendant); As to: John OC-18 Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Adoption Form of Amended Master Complaint for Plaintiff John OC-18 Doe; Filed by: John OC-18 Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 11 - Hon. David S. Cunningham III; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 12/29/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Cristina J. Nolan (Attorney): Organization Name: Manly, Stewart & Finaldi; Middle Name changed from J to J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John OC-18 Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange (Defendant); Rudolph Preciado (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John OC-18 Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange (Defendant); Rudolph Preciado (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John OC-18 Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange (Defendant); Rudolph Preciado (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less