This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2021 at 08:55:53 (UTC).

JOHN M.R. DOE VS LA'S BEST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 JOHN M R DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA'S BEST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS D. LONG, RUPERT A. BYRDSONG and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3425

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS D. LONG

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JOHN M.R.

Defendants

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

LOPEZ JANETTE

LA'S BEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURRITT KELLI D.

Defendant Attorneys

BACIO GARY A.

DUSSEAULT CHRISTOPHER

BACIO GARY ANTHONY

FALCHETTI SANDRA M.

FELDMAN JASON K.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

9/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LOPEZ'S FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

10/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LOPEZ'S FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Brief - BRIEF JOINT IDC BRIEF FOR 9-29-21

9/21/2021: Brief - BRIEF JOINT IDC BRIEF FOR 9-29-21

Notice of Ruling

8/18/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Substitution of Attorney

8/16/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

6/11/2021: Answer

Answer

6/22/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/8/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Brief - BRIEF JOINT STATEMENT RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

8/13/2021: Brief - BRIEF JOINT STATEMENT RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

4/21/2021: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS JOINT STATEMENT RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

4/26/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS JOINT STATEMENT RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE INCLUSION OF DEFENDANT LOPEZS SIGNATURE RE STIPULATION FOR COURTS IN | CAMERA REVIEW OF PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL RECORDS FROM DR. ZHANNA SAFOZBNIKOY SUBPOENAED BY DEFE

5/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE INCLUSION OF DEFENDANT LOPEZS SIGNATURE RE STIPULATION FOR COURTS IN | CAMERA REVIEW OF PLAINTIFF'S MEDICAL RECORDS FROM DR. ZHANNA SAFOZBNIKOY SUBPOENAED BY DEFE

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/10/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

5/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE IDC (FULLY EXECUTED)

5/12/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE IDC (FULLY EXECUTED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANT J...)

4/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE OF DEFENDANT J...)

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketJoint Stipulation and Order Re Lopez's Further Discovery Responses; Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketBrief (Joint IDC Brief for 9-29-21); Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Sandra Falchetti re Inability to Comply with Meet & Confer Requirement); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John M.R. Doe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV13425    Hearing Date: December 09, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOHN M.R. DOE,

Plaintiff,

v.

LA'S BEST , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 20STCV13425

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

INITIAL NOTE: This is not a tentative ruling. It is being posted with the tentative rulings to give Counsel notice not to appear. This is a final order and the case is being transferred.

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE BYRDSONG presiding in DEPT. 28 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: December 9, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: 20STCV13425    Hearing Date: November 23, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOHN M.R. DOE,

Plaintiff,

v.

LA'S BEST , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 20STCV13425

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

INITIAL NOTE: This is not a tentative ruling. It is being posted with the tentative rulings to give Counsel notice not to appear. This is a final order and the case is being transferred.

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 31 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE BYRDSONG presiding in DEPT. 28 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 23, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FALCHETTI SANDRA M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDMAN JASON K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BACIO GARY A. ESQ.