Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 15:04:56 (UTC).

JOHN METZGER, ET AL. VS AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 JOHN METZGER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7717

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METZGER JOHN

Defendants

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

KEENAN PROPERTIES INC.

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC FKA METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

R & L SEWERS

GEORGE DAKOVICH & SON INC.

MRC GLOBAL US INC.

FAMILIAN CORP.

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

EARLE M. JORGENSEN COMPANY

GRINNELL CORPORATION

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

KENNEDY PIPELINE CO.

J FLETCHER CREAMER & SON INC.

SOCO WEST INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST INC. FKA SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION FKA SOCO-WESTERN CHEMICAL CORPORATION FKA STINNES-WESTERN CHEMICAL CORPORATION

CK CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

JM MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC. DBA JM PIPE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

GILLESPIE CONSTRUCTION INC.

WATER APPLICATIONS DISTRIBUTION GROUP INC.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBLASE PATRICK ANDREW

Defendant Attorneys

BLEICHNER BRAD DAVID

LEMMON DUNCAN STEVEN

LOVE MARK A.

ARTHUR DAVID G

NICOL FARAH S.

NICHOLS STEPHEN MATTHEW

PETTY ROSS M

SAYRE MARK DAVID

DUFFY JOSEPH

RASMUSSEN JENNIFER C.

TALARICO AMY J.

LIN CARRIE

GOETZ ANDY JUSTIN

LONG JAYME C

DEJARDIN BRADFORD J.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

SMITH ERIC C.

PRINDLE KENNETH B.

GRIMM J. MICHAEL

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE JOHN TEMPLIN FROM SPECULATING THAT THE INSULATION HE OBSERVED AT MOBIL OIL'S TORRANCE REFINER

3/10/2020: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE JOHN TEMPLIN FROM SPECULATING THAT THE INSULATION HE OBSERVED AT MOBIL OIL'S TORRANCE REFINER

Separate Statement - Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO Defendant Wells Supply Company, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication

1/8/2020: Separate Statement - Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO Defendant Wells Supply Company, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

2/14/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Motion in Limine - DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE SPECULATION THAT J-MM SUPPLIED ACP IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY SPECIFIC PIPING CONTRACTS WITH THE CITY OF NEWPORT

2/19/2020: Motion in Limine - DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE SPECULATION THAT J-MM SUPPLIED ACP IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY SPECIFIC PIPING CONTRACTS WITH THE CITY OF NEWPORT

Motion in Limine - DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE RE: IRRELEVANT AND INFLAMMATORY INCIDENTS (MIL NO. 9)

2/19/2020: Motion in Limine - DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE RE: IRRELEVANT AND INFLAMMATORY INCIDENTS (MIL NO. 9)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE RE: IRRELEVANT AND INFLAMMATORY INCIDENTS, PENDING STIPULATION (MIL NO. 9)

2/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY EVIDENCE RE: IRRELEVANT AND INFLAMMATORY INCIDENTS, PENDING STIPULATION (MIL NO. 9)

Motion in Limine - DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF A PROPOSED EPA "BAN" ON ASBESTOS PRODUCTS THAT NEVER WENT INTO EFFECT

2/18/2020: Motion in Limine - DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF A PROPOSED EPA "BAN" ON ASBESTOS PRODUCTS THAT NEVER WENT INTO EFFECT

Motion in Limine - JOINT DEFENSE MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE AND COMMENT ON THE "POSITION STATEMENT OF ASBESTOS" FROM THE JOINT POLICY COMMITTEE OF THE SOCIETIES OF EPIDEMIOLOGY; DECLARATION

2/19/2020: Motion in Limine - JOINT DEFENSE MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE AND COMMENT ON THE "POSITION STATEMENT OF ASBESTOS" FROM THE JOINT POLICY COMMITTEE OF THE SOCIETIES OF EPIDEMIOLOGY; DECLARATION

Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

2/5/2020: Opposition - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

Objection - DEFENDANT EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' PAGE-LINE DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF STEPHEN CHORLEY ON MAY 4, 2010

2/18/2020: Objection - DEFENDANT EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' PAGE-LINE DESIGNATIONS OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF STEPHEN CHORLEY ON MAY 4, 2010

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/7/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Separate Statement - DEFENDANT, WATER APPLICATIONS DISTRIBUTION GROUP, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMM

1/8/2020: Separate Statement - DEFENDANT, WATER APPLICATIONS DISTRIBUTION GROUP, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMM

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MS2G, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/9/2020: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MS2G, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/5/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

9/10/2019: Answer

Answer

9/12/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

441 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Hearing06/23/2021 at 13:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm, Address, Telephone Number, Facsimile and Email Address; Filed by Jayme C. Long, Esq. (Attorney); ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Status Conference ((DeBlase Brown Eyerly LLP)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (DeBlase Brown Eyerly LLP))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Shell Oil Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketStipulation Regarding Exxonmobil Oil Corporation; Filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer of Defendant George Dakovich & Son, Inc. to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Request for Jury Trial; Filed by George Dakovich & Son, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
448 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by John Metzger (Plaintiff); Gail Metzger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by John Metzger (Plaintiff); Gail Metzger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by John Metzger (Plaintiff); Gail Metzger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by John Metzger (Plaintiff); Gail Metzger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by John Metzger (Plaintiff); Gail Metzger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Metzger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Metzger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GILLESPIE CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEORGE DAKOVICH & SON INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where R & L SEWERS is a litigant

Latest cases where CK CONSTRUCTION CO. INC. is a litigant