This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 04:32:51 (UTC).

JOHN MCILWRAITH VS IRVING ORNELAS CAMACHO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 JOHN MCILWRAITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IRVING ORNELAS CAMACHO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7717

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCILWRAITH JOHN

Defendants

MARTINEZ ON TIME PARCEL INC.

ORNELAS CAMACHO IRVING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

REISINGER ROBERT LEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

12/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

12/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/19/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2024
  • Hearing07/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • Hearing07/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/11/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/25/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant); As to: John McIlwraith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: John McIlwraith (Plaintiff); As to: Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/23/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John McIlwraith (Plaintiff); As to: Irving Ornelas Camacho (Defendant); Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John McIlwraith (Plaintiff); As to: Irving Ornelas Camacho (Defendant); Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John McIlwraith (Plaintiff); As to: Irving Ornelas Camacho (Defendant); Martinez on Time Parcel, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less