This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 00:03:23 (UTC).

JOHN LYNCH VS OCEANIC MEDIA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 JOHN LYNCH filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OCEANIC MEDIA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2478

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LYNCH JOHN

Defendants

OCEANIC MEDIA LLC

WORLD OF WAVES PRODUCTION LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYRNES CRAIG T.

Defendant Attorneys

GHOLIAN AVI

SALUJA SARINA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

4/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD- ORANGE CO- CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - 30-202101233725

12/6/2021: RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD- ORANGE CO- CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - 30-202101233725

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

11/19/2021: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

Receipt for Transmitted Record

11/18/2021: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

11/18/2021: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/13/2021

9/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/13/2021

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/13/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketReturned Receipt for Transmitted Record- Orange Co- Central Justice Center - 30-202101233725; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 37; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Transfer Venue); Filed by Oceanic Media, LLC (Defendant); World of Waves Production, LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John Lynch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Lynch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Lynch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNES, CRAIG T.