This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 01:10:13 (UTC).

JOHN LINSAO, ET AL. VS FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA DOMICILED CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 JOHN LINSAO, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA DOMICILED CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3541

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LINSAO JOHN

LINSAO MAURA

Defendants

BROADHEAD JAMES

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER 04 SFA0007584 01 ISSUED BY AND THROUGH WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE SERVICES LLC IN CALIFORNIA

COCHRAN JOAN

FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA DOMICILED CORPORATION

HISCOX U.S. FLOOD CONSORTIUM 9762 LEAD UNDERWRITER ISSUED BY AND THROUGH WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE SERVICES LLC IN CALIFORNIA

WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZOG IAN ISAAC

Defendant Attorneys

LEVITT JOHN S.

ROBIE LEIGH

WILLIS JOSHUA NORMAN

DOWNES PATRICK N.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION)

5/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/26/2023

4/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/26/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/06/2023

2/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/06/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 02/06/2023

2/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 02/06/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 05/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 11/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 11/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: the Status of Mediation scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 03/11/2024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 06/26/2024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 07/05/2024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Consolidation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 20STCV47368, and 22STCV03541 consolidated; case number 20STCV47368 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 07/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 11/09/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: John Linsao (Plaintiff); Maura Linsao (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Linsao (Plaintiff); Maura Linsao (Plaintiff); As to: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California Domiciled Corporation (Defendant); Hiscox U.S. Flood Consortium 9762, Lead Underwriter issued by and through WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC, in California (Defendant); CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, subscribing to Certificate number 04 SFA0007584 01, issued by and through WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC, in California (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Linsao (Plaintiff); Maura Linsao (Plaintiff); As to: FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California Domiciled Corporation (Defendant); Hiscox U.S. Flood Consortium 9762, Lead Underwriter issued by and through WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC, in California (Defendant); CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, subscribing to Certificate number 04 SFA0007584 01, issued by and through WRIGHT NATIONAL FLOOD INSURANCE SERVICES, LLC, in California (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less