Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 06:56:38 (UTC).

JOHN LAUREL APODACA, ET AL. VS A BETTER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 JOHN LAUREL APODACA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A BETTER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0960

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APODACA JOHN LAUREL

JOHNSON DEVON WESLEY

Defendant

A BETTER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • Hearing07/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOHN LAUREL APODACA (Plaintiff); DEVON WESLEY JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JOHN LAUREL APODACA (Plaintiff); DEVON WESLEY JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOHN LAUREL APODACA (Plaintiff); DEVON WESLEY JOHNSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A BETTER PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN