This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 05:01:07 (UTC).

JOHN KERKENRATH ET AL VS MOVE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/20/2018 JOHN KERKENRATH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MOVE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN I. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3233

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILSON TINA

HERKENRATH JOHN

Defendants

MOVE INC

MOVE SALES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARIAS MIKE M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

STONE RICHARD LEE

 

Court Documents

Other -

5/3/2018: Other -

Other -

4/27/2018: Other -

Other -

4/27/2018: Other -

Summons

4/20/2018: Summons

Other -

4/20/2018: Other -

Other -

5/24/2018: Other -

Other -

5/24/2018: Other -

Other -

5/24/2018: Other -

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

Order

5/22/2018: Order

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Status Report

12/4/2018: Status Report

Minute Order

6/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/6/2018: Minute Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketStatus Report (as to Status of Removed Case); Filed by Move inc (Defendant); Move Sales Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 11; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 10; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-06 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-22 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (Code Civ. Proc., 170.6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by John Herkenrath (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by John Herkenrath (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Herkenrath (Plaintiff); Tina wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOVE SALES INC. DBA REALTOR.COM is a litigant

Latest cases where MOVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FANG, ERICKA