This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 05:40:23 (UTC).

JOHN HINZ VS SIERRA CLUB

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 JOHN HINZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SIERRA CLUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN and ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8869

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HINZ JOHN

Defendants and Respondents

SIERRA CLUB

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

COPPOLA ROBERT D. JR. ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert D. Coppola, Jr.

23371 Schoolcraft St.

West Hills, CA 91307

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HANDLER ERIC A

HANDLER ERIC ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES BY STIPULATION

7/29/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES BY STIPULATION

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

7/29/2020: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AN...)

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AN...)

Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AFTER EX PARTE HEARING FOR A CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES BY STIPULATION

8/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AFTER EX PARTE HEARING FOR A CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES BY STIPULATION

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/13/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

10/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/1/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/2/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/2/2019: Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RULING RE DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/11/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RULING RE DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - Opposition by Plaintiff John Hinz to Defendant Sierra Club's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

1/23/2019: Opposition - Opposition by Plaintiff John Hinz to Defendant Sierra Club's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF JOHN HINZ TO DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/5/2018: OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF JOHN HINZ TO DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/04/2018

10/4/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/04/2018

Minute Order -

9/5/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/18/2018: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF ERIC A. HANDLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/17/2018: DECLARATION OF ERIC A. HANDLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

3/23/2018: SUMMONS -

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Hearing01/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Robert D. Jr. Coppola, ESQ. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by John Hinz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by John Hinz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by John Hinz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PIFILIP R. EAGER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ERIC A. HANDLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANT SIERRA CLUB TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Jury Instructions; Filed by Sierra Club (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by John Hinz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Hinz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698869    Hearing Date: October 01, 2020    Dept: 61

Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. (“CCP”) section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under CCP section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if know. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”

The present motion pertains to attorney Robert D. Coppola, Jr., counsel for Plaintiff John Hinz. The motion complies with the above requirements.

Attorney Robert D. Coppola, Jr.’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff John Hinz is GRANTED.

Case Number: BC698869    Hearing Date: September 21, 2020    Dept: 61

Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. (“CCP”) section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under CCP section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if know. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”

The present motion pertains to attorney Robert D. Coppola, Jr., counsel for Plaintiff John Hinz. The motion complies with the above requirements.

Attorney Robert D. Coppola, Jr.’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff John Hinz is GRANTED.