This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 09:57:58 (UTC).

JOHN HALL III EDD VS GREENWOOD HALL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 JOHN HALL III EDD filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against GREENWOOD HALL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7473

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HALL JOHN III ED.D

HALL JOHN III

Defendants and Respondents

PCS LINK INC

BRADFIELD WILLIAM

DOES 1 TO 15

GREENWOOD HALL INC

Intervenor

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HARDIN JAMES B. ESQ.

HARDIN JAMES BYRON

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/27/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

4/9/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

4/25/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order

4/25/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND DEPOSITIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF FERNANDO A. VICENTE

6/20/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND DEPOSITIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF FERNANDO A. VICENTE

DECLARATION OF JAMES HARDIN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO INTERVENOR'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND DEPOSITIONS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $1

7/13/2018: DECLARATION OF JAMES HARDIN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO INTERVENOR'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND DEPOSITIONS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $1

Minute Order

8/9/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/29/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

10/10/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/11/2019: Request for Dismissal

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/5/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) DEFAMATION-SLANDER PER SE; ETC.

1/12/2018: FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1) DEFAMATION-SLANDER PER SE; ETC.

SUMMONS

1/12/2018: SUMMONS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1) DEFAMAT1ON-SLANDER PER SE; ETC

12/29/2017: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1) DEFAMAT1ON-SLANDER PER SE; ETC

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • Request for Dismissal (Amended ( with Prejudice)); Filed by John III Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Further Status Conference (ReTrial Procedures and Amended Pleadings) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by John III Hall (Plaintiff); John III Ed.D Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Minute Order ((Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (As to Intervenor Lloyd's London (Beazley Only)); Filed by John III Hall (Plaintiff); John III Ed.D Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Summons; Filed by John III Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by John III Hall (Plaintiff); John III Ed.D Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1) DEFAMAT1ON-SLANDER PER SE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCS Link, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Greenwood Hall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER B1180D190825/1197JK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARDIN JAMES B. ESQ.