This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 13:39:05 (UTC).

JOHN DOOMEY, ET AL. VS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 JOHN DOOMEY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7286

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOOMEY ELIZABETH

DOOMEY JOHN

Defendants

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES

CHATTEM INC.

CRA TRAILERS INC. FKA GREAT DANE TRAILERS INC

CUMMINS INC.

CVS HEALTH CORPORATION FKA CVS CORP FKA CVS CAREMARK CORP

DAIMLER TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA LLC

DCO LLC

EATON CORPORATION

ENERPAC TOOL GROUP CORP. FKA ACTUANT CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR-IN INTEREST AND SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO APPLIED POWER INC. APPLIED POWER INDUSTRIES INC. BEAR MANUFACTURING COMPANY AND BEAR AUTOMOTIVE SERVICES EQUIPMENT COMPANY

FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST

FMC CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY DBA NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION NAPA

GLAMOUR INDUSTRIES CO.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

MACK TRUCKS INC.

MERITOR INC. FKA ARVINMERITOR INC.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

ADAMS BENJAMIN H

ASPERICUETA ERIKA ROSE

ESQ. PAUL LANNUS

AGOPIAN SHAGHIG

HINDS JENNIFER

TAVERA LEONARD M

ANDERSON-THOMPSON GABRIELLE JAYNEA

BELBAHRI SALEEM

HINDS JENNIFER NEIMAN

KARBASSI NILOFAR

CAPPY ROD J.

COGGSHALL WILLIAM LAMAR

EBRAHAMIAN SALIN

LUONG KAREN

MILBRODT JEREMY

NORMAN JAMIE

OSTERTAG JAMES J

BRADY MATTHEW S.

NICOL FARAH S.

ONGARO DAVID

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

4/22/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (DOOMEY-21STCV47286))

4/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (DOOMEY-21STCV47286))

Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT

4/11/2022: Case Management Statement - CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/12/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

4/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/15/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/15/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer

3/22/2022: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

2/17/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/18/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

2/22/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER

2/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMURRER

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/23/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (Defendant); STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15; Initial Status Conference ((Doomey-21STCV47286)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference (Doomey-21STCV47286))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by GLAMOUR INDUSTRIES, CO. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement (Joint); Filed by John Doomey (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Doomey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ENERPAC TOOL GROUP CORP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketMetropolitan Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos; Filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDefendant Morse Tec LLC Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages (Personal Injury- Asbestos); Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by MORSE TEC LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer (of Defendant The Pep Boys Manny Moe and Jack of California to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury- Asbestos); Filed by THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Doomey (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Doomey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Doomey (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Doomey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John Doomey (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Doomey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET; Filed by John Doomey (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Doomey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLAMOUR INDUSTRIES CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ENERPAC TOOL GROUP CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES. A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where MERITOR, INC. is a litigant