This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 21:12:18 (UTC).

JOHN DOE VS SOUTHEASTERN CALIFORNIA CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 JOHN DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHEASTERN CALIFORNIA CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8389

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JOHN

Defendants

NORTH AMERICAN DIVISION OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS

SOUTHEASTERN CALIFORNIA CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON ROBERT WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/31/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/31/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/31/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/31/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/30/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Request for Dismissal

12/30/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/18/2023

1/18/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/18/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for failure to appear on 1/18/23; scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 01/18/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/28/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by John Doe on 12/30/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by John Doe as to Southeastern California Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Southeastern California Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant); North American Division of Seventh-Day Adventists, an entity of unknown type (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Southeastern California Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: John Doe (Plaintiff); Southeastern California Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant); North American Division of Seventh-Day Adventists, an entity of unknown type (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Southeastern California Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant); North American Division of Seventh-Day Adventists, an entity of unknown type (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Southeastern California Conference of Seventh-Day Adventists, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHEASTERN CALIFORNIA CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON ROBERT WILLIAM