This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 10:22:24 (UTC).

JOHN DOE VS REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 JOHN DOE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3416

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOE JOHN

Respondent

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Interested Party

LOS ANGELES TIMES COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

VONESCHEN LISA ANNE

Respondent Attorney

GHERINI JOHN GARLAND

Interested Party Attorney

AVILES KELLY ANN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; TRIAL SETTING...)

11/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; TRIAL SETTING...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: (1) RELATED CASES AND (2) CONTINUING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

11/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: (1) RELATED CASES AND (2) CONTINUING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/1/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

11/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Reply - REPLY PETITIONERS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

10/31/2022: Reply - REPLY PETITIONERS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECL. OF KELLY AVILES; EXS. A-N

10/26/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECL. OF KELLY AVILES; EXS. A-N

Opposition - RESPONDENT THE REGENTS STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

10/26/2022: Opposition - RESPONDENT THE REGENTS STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Proof of Personal Service

10/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE FOR TRO AND OSC RE P.I.

10/21/2022: Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE FOR TRO AND OSC RE P.I.

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

10/21/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, FOR TEMPORARY R...)

10/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, JOHN DOE, FOR TEMPORARY R...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF TRO AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

10/21/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF TRO AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/19/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LISA VON ESCHEN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

10/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LISA VON ESCHEN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Trial Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Trial Setting...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 updated: Result Date to 11/09/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCP03412, 22STCP03416, and 22STCP03417 consolidated; case number 22STCP03412 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 21STCP01727, 22STCP03416 are related; case number 21STCP01727 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 86 - Hon. Mitchell L. Beckloff; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: JOHN DOE (Petitioner); As to: REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA (Respondent); LOS ANGELES TIMES COMMUNICATIONS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Real Party in Interest)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case NOTE: DEPT 86 HAS EARLIER-FILED CASE: Name Extension: NOTE: DEPT 86 HAS EARLIER-FILED CASE; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 01/05/2023 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mary H. Strobel in Department 82 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Lisa Anne VonEschen (Attorney): Last Name changed from Von Eschen to VonEschen; Organization Name changed from Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman & Machtinger LLP to Greenberg Glusker LLP; Middle Name changed from A. to Anne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAddress for Lisa Anne VonEschen (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPetition VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1085) AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Petitioner); As to: REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOHN DOE (Petitioner); As to: REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHERINI, JOHN G.