This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2023 at 04:33:33 (UTC).

JOHN DOE VS CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 JOHN DOE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF MONTEBELLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3976

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DOE JOHN

Respondent

CITY OF MONTEBELLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JIMENEZ DAVID LUIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

11/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF RE: VIOLATIONS OF THE RALPH M. BROWN ACT, THE CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS ACT AND THE CALIFORNIA CONS

11/4/2022: Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF RE: VIOLATIONS OF THE RALPH M. BROWN ACT, THE CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS ACT AND THE CALIFORNIA CONS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

11/7/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

2/15/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 02/21/2023

2/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 02/21/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

2/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • Hearing04/27/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 04/27/2023 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82 updated: Result Date to 03/14/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 03/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) of 02/21/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82 updated: Result Date to 02/21/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAddress for David Luis Jimenez (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 02/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mary H. Strobel in Department 82 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- David Luis Jimenez (Attorney): First Name changed from DAVID to David; Last Name changed from JIMENEZ to Jimenez; Organization Name changed from Jimenez Law LLP to Jimenez Law; Middle Name: Luis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketPetition PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF RE: VIOLATIONS OF THE RALPH M. BROWN ACT, THE CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS ACT AND THE CALIFORNIA CONSTITUTION; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner); As to: City of Montebello (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner); As to: City of Montebello (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner); As to: City of Montebello (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: John Doe (Petitioner); As to: City of Montebello (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less