This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 06:02:53 (UTC).

JOHN DOE VS CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 JOHN DOE filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1085

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JOHN

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYRD RACHELE RENEE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 03/10/2023

3/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 03/10/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

3/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/14/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - DEFENDANT CREDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM'S NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

2/6/2023: Notice - DEFENDANT CREDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM'S NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

1/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/25/2023

1/25/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/25/2023

Notice of Related Case

1/19/2023: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Initial Status Conference Order

1/13/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/13/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

1/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/13/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/30/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • Hearing08/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Removal scheduled for 08/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Removal to Federal Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Removal to Federal Court) of 03/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/29/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDefendant Credars-Sinai Health System's Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California; Filed by: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: John Doe (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/25/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less