This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2023 at 06:44:33 (UTC).

JOHN DOE LA 1939 VS DOE ARCHDIOCESE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 JOHN DOE LA 1939 filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DOE ARCHDIOCESE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9092

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE LA 1939 JOHN

Defendants

DOE ARCHDIOCESE

DOE DIOCESE

DOE RELIGIOUS ORDER

DOE SCHOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RECK MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

DILLMAN KIRK D

MEEK MICHELLE KRISTIN

NATELBORG KENNETH M.

 

Court Documents

Answer Answer to Amended Master Complaint

7/17/2023: Answer Answer to Amended Master Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer Answer Answer Of Defendant Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack Of California Llc, F/K/A The Pep Boys – Manny Mo & Jack Of California To Plaintiff’s Complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos

6/16/2023: Answer Answer Answer Of Defendant Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack Of California Llc, F/K/A The Pep Boys – Manny Mo & Jack Of California To Plaintiff’s Complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/16/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/25/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/25/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer Answer to Amended Master Complaint for Damages

5/23/2023: Answer Answer to Amended Master Complaint for Damages

Proof of Service by Substituted Service Proof of Service of Summons

5/12/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service Proof of Service of Summons

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/12/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Order (name extension) Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939's Application for In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action and Order to Seal and Keep Confidential all Certificates of Merit

3/10/2023: Order (name extension) Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939's Application for In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action and Order to Seal and Keep Confidential all Certificates of Merit

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

1/17/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 01/17/2023

1/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 01/17/2023

Notice of Lodging (name extension) Notice of Lodging Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939's Notice of Lodging Certificates of Merit for Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939 Confidentially for in Camera Review, Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 340.1

12/19/2022: Notice of Lodging (name extension) Notice of Lodging Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939's Notice of Lodging Certificates of Merit for Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939 Confidentially for in Camera Review, Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 340.1

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/19/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application (name extension) Application Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939's Application for (1) In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action and (2) Order to Seal and Keep Confidential All Certificates of Merit

12/19/2022: Application (name extension) Application Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939's Application for (1) In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action and (2) Order to Seal and Keep Confidential All Certificates of Merit

Summons Summons on Complaint

12/16/2022: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Master Complaint; Filed by: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); As to: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketAnswer Answer Of Defendant Pep Boys, Manny Moe & Jack Of California Llc, F/K/A The Pep Boys Manny Mo & Jack Of California To Plaintiffs Complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos; Filed by: Doe Religious Order (Defendant); As to: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Doe Religious Order (Defendant); As to: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Religious Order (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Master Complaint for Damages; Filed by: Doe Diocese (Defendant); As to: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Diocese (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: Doe School (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 171.00; Proof of Mailing Date: 04/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOrder Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939's Application for In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action and Order to Seal and Keep Confidential all Certificates of Merit; Signed and Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketApplication Plaintiff John Doe LA 1939's Application for (1) In Camera Finding of Reasonable and Meritorious Cause for Filing of Action and (2) Order to Seal and Keep Confidential All Certificates of Merit; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe School (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe School (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Doe LA 1939 (Plaintiff); As to: Doe Archdiocese (Defendant); Doe Diocese (Defendant); Doe School (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less