This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 13:01:09 (UTC).

JOHN DOE KG, ET AL. VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 JOHN DOE KG, filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and THOMAS C. FALLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1157

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

THOMAS C. FALLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOE DY JOHN

DOE HS JOHN

DOE KG JOHN

DOE MC JOHN

Defendant

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GAINES J.KYLE

LEWIS JAMES W

Defendant Attorney

BAUM ANDREW P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/4/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/6/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/6/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Related Case

10/11/2022: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/18/2022

10/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/18/2022

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/31/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/10/2022

11/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/10/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/10/2022

11/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/10/2022

Answer

11/10/2022: Answer

Notice of Appearance

11/10/2022: Notice of Appearance

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY CASE(S)...) OF 11/17/2022

11/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY CASE(S)...) OF 11/17/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY CASE(S)...)

11/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY CASE(S)...)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: As To Why Your Case Should Not Be Related To O E vs. County of Los Angeles, LASC Case No. 21STCV13373, The Oldest Confirmed MacLaren Hall Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: As To Why Your Case Should Not Be Related To O E vs. County of Los Angeles, LASC Case No. 21STCV13373, The Oldest Confirmed MacLaren Hall Case scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Setting Order To Show Cause As To Why Case(s)...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Setting Order To Show Cause As To Why Case(s)...) of 11/17/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity (Defendant); As to: JOHN DOE KG (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE MC (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE HS (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 21STCV20949, 22PSCV01121, 21STCV13373, 22PSCV01157, 22PSCV00460 are related; case number 21STCV13373 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order) of 11/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: JOHN DOE KG (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE MC (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE HS (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE DY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JOHN DOE KG (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE MC (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE HS (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE DY (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JOHN DOE KG (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE MC (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE HS (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE DY (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JOHN DOE KG (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE MC (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE HS (Plaintiff); JOHN DOE DY (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas C. Falls in Department R Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAINES J. KYLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS JAMES W.