This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 06:16:58 (UTC).

JOHN DOE H.S., AN INDIVIDUAL, VS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; A CALIFORNIA RELIGIOUS CORPORATION SOLE;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 JOHN DOE H S , AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES A CALIFORNIA RELIGIOUS CORPORATION SOLE ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2740

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE H.S. AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN

Defendants

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION AN UNKNOWN ENTITY DBA ST. DOROTHY CATHOLIC CHURCH

ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; A CALIFORNIA RELIGIOUS CORPORATION SOLE;

ST. DOROTHY CATHOLIC SCHOOL AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARMINAK TAMAR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: OBJECTIONS TO NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF C...)

2/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: OBJECTIONS TO NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF C...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO UNSEA...)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO UNSEA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

6/15/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/8/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/7/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...)

2/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/7/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...) OF 02/07/2022

2/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...) OF 02/07/2022

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/24/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/14/2023 01:45 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Objections to Notice of Lodgment of C...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/23/2023 01:45 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other to Unsea...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/21/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe H.S., an individual, (Plaintiff); As to: ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; a California religious corporation sole; (Defendant); ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION, an unknown entity (Defendant); ST. DOROTHY CATHOLIC SCHOOL, an unknown entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Doe H.S., an individual, (Plaintiff); As to: ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF LOS ANGELES; a California religious corporation sole; (Defendant); ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES EDUCATION & WELFARE CORPORATION, an unknown entity (Defendant); ST. DOROTHY CATHOLIC SCHOOL, an unknown entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less