This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 22:00:28 (UTC).

JOHN DOE (D.C.) VS SANTA MONICA POLICE ACTIVITIES LEAGUE, A 501(C)3 CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 JOHN DOE D C filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SANTA MONICA POLICE ACTIVITIES LEAGUE, A 501 C 3 CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7551

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE D.C. JOHN

Defendants

CITY OF SANTA MONICA A PUBLIC ENTITY

SANTA MONICA POLICE ACTIVITIES LEAGUE A 501C3 CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANISH BRIAN J

Defendant Attorney

ANDRADE SEAN A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/7/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2024
  • Hearing12/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • Hearing06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • Hearing06/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Santa Monica, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by John Doe (D.C.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by John Doe (D.C.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Doe (D.C.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by John Doe (D.C.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John Doe (D.C.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA MONICA POLICE ACTIVITIES LEAGUE A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH